HERRMAN v. SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: JANET HERRMAN
Defendant: KIENLE ASSOCIATES, ANDREW M. STEINKELER, E. GARY LAMSBACK, SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES, JOHN/JANE DOE 1-9 and ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv01939
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, together with with Affirmative Defenses by E. GARY LAMSBACK.(RYAN, DANIEL)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulation to Amend Complaint by E. GARY LAMSBACK. (RYAN, DANIEL)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Merit by CHARLES S. COOPER on behalf of JANET HERRMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 6/5/2019 (lisad, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Merit by CHARLES S. COOPER on behalf of JANET HERRMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 6/5/2019 (lisad, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by E. GARY LAMSBACK Notice of Intention to Enter Judgment of Non Pros (RYAN, DANIEL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING:AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/23/2019 AT 3:30 PM IN CHAMBERS (RM. 10613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET HERRMAN re: RON STEIN served Summons and Complaint upon KIENLE ASSOCIATES, ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER, SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES, ANDREW M. STEINKELER by DEE PREECE, AUTHORIZED AGENT ACCEPTED SERVICE ON BEHALF. KIENLE ASSOCIATES served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019; ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019; SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019; ANDREW M. STEINKELER served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (sg, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET HERRMAN re: RON STEIN served Summons and Complaint upon E. GARY LAMSBACK by KATHY PICKUP, AUTHORIZED AGENT ACCEPTED SERVICE ON BEHALF. E. GARY LAMSBACK served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (sg, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ron Stein re: served Complaint, Summons upon Andrew M. Steinkeler by personal on 05/21/19 (COOPER, CHARLES)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ron Stein re: served Complaint, Summons upon oral maxillofacial surgery by personal on 05/21/19 (COOPER, CHARLES)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ron Stein re: served Complaint, Summons upon Kienle Associates by personal on 05/21/19 (COOPER, CHARLES)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL F. RYAN, III on behalf of E. GARY LAMSBACK (RYAN, DANIEL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE C. PLYTER on behalf of E. GARY LAMSBACK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PLYTER, MARIE)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY V. GITTLEMAN on behalf of ANDREW M. STEINKELER with Jury Demand(GITTLEMAN, GARY)
May 3, 2019 Five (5) Summonses Issued as to KIENLE ASSOCIATES, E. GARY LAMSBACK, ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER, SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES and ANDREW M. STEINKELER. Forwarded To: counsel on 5/7/19 (mbh, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against JOHN/JANE DOE 1-9, KIENLE ASSOCIATES, E. GARY LAMSBACK, ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER, SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES and ANDREW M. STEINKELER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE196758) filed by JANET HERRMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheets)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #2 Designation) (mbh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERRMAN v. SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIENLE ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. STEINKELER
Represented By: GARY V. GITTLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. GARY LAMSBACK
Represented By: DANIEL F. RYAN, III
Represented By: MARIE C. PLYTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHELKUN AND KIENLE ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORAL MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET HERRMAN
Represented By: CHARLES S. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?