ADAMS et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: JOHN GONDOR, BARON KAILEE ADAMS, MASJID AL MEDINAH, BARON KAILEE ADAMS, LLC, ADAM MUHUMMAD and YELLOW PALMS MINING INC.
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, UPPER DARBY POLICE DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02030
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED IN THIS CASE HE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY(30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT FOR THE SIX (6)MONTH PERIOD FROM 11/9/18 THROUGH 5/9/19 OR REMIT THE $400.00FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jpd, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 (lvj, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF BARON KAILEE ADAMS' MOTION TO ENTER THIS TRUE COMPLAINT CORRECT AND ENTER INTO THE COURT.(jpd, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN PLAINTIFF'S UNSIGNED COMPLAINT TO HIM AND SHALL RETAIN A COPY IN THE CASE FILE. PLAINTIFF SHALL SIGN THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST ALSO WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER SUBMIT THE $400.00 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT FOR THE SIX (6) MONTH PERIOD FROM 11/9/18 THROUGH 5/9/19. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE PLAINTIFF WITH A COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT BEARING THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND OR CLOSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED JUDGE CHAD F. KENNY ON 5/15/19. 5/16/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) Modified on 5/21/2019 (lvj, ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UPPER DARBY POLICE DEPARTMENT (NO FEE, NO IFP), filed by YELLOW PALMS MINING INC., ADAM MUHUMMAD, BARON KAILEE ADAMS, LLC, BARON KAILEE ADAMS, JOHN GONDOR, MASJID AL MEDINAH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GONDOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARON KAILEE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASJID AL MEDINAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARON KAILEE ADAMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM MUHUMMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YELLOW PALMS MINING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPPER DARBY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?