HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC
Plaintiff: HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02036
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 7/9/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/4/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BRYCE L. CALLAHAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/29/19. 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/30/2019) (mbh, ).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF R. PAUL YETTER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/29/19. 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bryce L. Callahan ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13571352.) filed by HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(DIVER, EDWARD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of R. Paul Yetter ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13571301.) filed by HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(DIVER, EDWARD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED G. DERITIS on behalf of MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC (DERITIS, FRED)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH P. WEISSERT on behalf of MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC (WEISSERT, ELIZABETH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. LECKERMAN on behalf of MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC (LECKERMAN, JASON)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE E. JOHN on behalf of MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC (JOHN, LESLIE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD A. DIVER on behalf of HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(DIVER, EDWARD)
May 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (ahf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HMSHOST CORPORATION, Corporate Parent AUTOGRILL S.P.A. for HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.. by HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC..(ahf)
May 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/10/2019 (ahf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197158.), filed by HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: HOWARD I. LANGER
Represented By: R. PAUL YETTER
Represented By: BRYCE L. CALLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKETPLACE, PHL, LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH P. WEISSERT
Represented By: JASON A. LECKERMAN
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Represented By: FRED G. DERITIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?