HINES v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Plaintiff: RANEESHIA T. HINES
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02041
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEADLINE FOR CSS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 6/19/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/5/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 6/10/2019 (rf, ). *FILED IN ERROR, WRONG CASE * REFILED IN CORRECT CASE #19-401 Modified on 6/11/2019 (md).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT CASE IS REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CERTIFIED COPY OF REMAND ORDER SENT TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY ON 6/5/19*(rf, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WITH THE BAD FAITH ALLEGATIONS DISMISSED, PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED DAMAGES DO NOT EXCEED $50,000 AND THE CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS COMPULSORY ARBITRATION PROGRAM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Bad Faith From Plaintiff's Complaint, and for Remand, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/5/2019 (md).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 4) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/29/19. 5/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by RANEESHIA T. HINES., EXHIBITS, JURY TRIAL DEMAND.(rf, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.Brief and Certificate of Service.(MILLER, LORI)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(mbh, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190403236. (Filing fee $400 receipt number PPE197195), Certificate of Service.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINES v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANEESHIA T. HINES
Represented By: JEFFREY R. LESSIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: LORI C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?