CLARK v. COMMONWEALTH
Plaintiff: DORIAN CLARK and STEVEN JACOBS
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH, ADA JOO KIM, JOO KIM, CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN and CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02053
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT CLARK'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE. (JL)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT CLARK'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN, JOO KIM, filed by PRO SE PETITIONER DORIAN CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. DORIAN CLARK SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDWER TO THE WARDEN OF CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. CLARK'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR REASONS IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. IF CLARK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/19/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND WARDEN.(mbh, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/18/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND WARDEN(mbh, ).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT CLARK'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS FRIVOLOUS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; CLARK'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE COMMONWEALTH ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; CLARK'S CLAIMS AGAINST ADA JOO KIM ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; CLARK IS GIVEN THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE EVENT HE CAN STATE A PLAUSIBLE BASIS FOR A CLAIM AND UPON THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHAL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) Modified on 6/19/2019 (jaa, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH, filed by PRO SE PLFF DORIAN CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1915. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. CLARK'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1915(E)(2)(B)(i) AND (ii), FOR THE REASONS IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. CLARK IS GIVEN THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE EVENT HE CAN STATE A LEGITIMATE NON-FRIVOLOUS BASIS FOR A CLAIM AGAINST AN APPROPRIATE DEFENDANT. IF CLARK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/5/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CLARK AND THE WARDEN OF CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. (fdc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/5/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CLARK AND WARDEN OF CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. (fdc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ENVELOPE ATTACHED filed by DORIAN CLARK.(rf, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DORIAN CLARK. (sg, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT IF CLARK SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH CLARK WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/14/19. 5/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORMS.(jaa, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH, filed by DORIAN CLARK. NO FEE. NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. COMMONWEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIAN CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA JOO KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOO KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?