STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY v. MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: FRIGIDAIRE, MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD., MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD. and MIDEA USA INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02065
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AB Electrolux by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., FRIGIDAIRE.(VOTER, WARREN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., FRIGIDAIRE. Affirmative Defenses.(VOTER, WARREN) Modified on 6/18/2019 (tjd).
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MIDEA USA INC..(VOTER, WARREN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MIDEA USA INC. Affirmative Defenses.(VOTER, WARREN) Modified on 6/14/2019 (tjd).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION.(VOTER, WARREN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION.(VOTER, WARREN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Lucaa McGill served Summons and Complaint upon MIDEA USA INC. by Personal Service. MIDEA USA INC. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Earl Lovett served Summons and Complaint upon ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. by Personal Service. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Earl Lovett served Summons and Complaint upon FRIGIDAIRE by Personal Service. FRIGIDAIRE served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY re: Austin Reed served Summons and Complaint upon MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION by Personal Service. MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL) Modified on 5/21/2019 (tjd).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANIES for STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY.(jwl, )
May 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., FRIGIDAIRE, GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD., MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD., MIDEA USA INC.. Seven Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/13/19 (jwl, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., FRIGIDAIRE, GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD., MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD., MIDEA USA INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197271.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY v. MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRIGIDAIRE
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA USA INC.
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?