VONK et al v. CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: NANETTE TARAYA-VONK and JOHN VONK
Defendant: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02130
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/9/19. 7/9/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Settlement Conference held on 7/8/19. (fdc, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONFERENCE ORDER. ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR MONDAY, 7/8/19 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3D BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 6/10/19. 6/10/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. A Pretrial Conference was held on 6/4/19. (fdc)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/10/19 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614) BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE, ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 10/4/19, DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/25/19, MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/22/19, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/18/19, PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/15/19, DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/15/19, TRIAL DATE SET FOR 12/12/19 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/4/19. 6/4/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(JESUIT, CHARLES)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NANETTE TARAYA-VONK, JOHN VONK. (OCHROCH, RICHARD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting (Joint) by CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (JESUIT, CHARLES)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. JESUIT, JR on behalf of CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(JESUIT, CHARLES)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 6/3/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/23/19. 5/23/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (FREED, ERIC) Modified on 5/23/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/4/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/17/19. 5/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent CHUBB LIMITED, Corporate Parent CHUBB INA HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS INC. for CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. with Certificate of Service by CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(ahf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190403295. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197446) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ahf) (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/17/2019) (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VONK et al v. CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ERIC D. FREED
Represented By: CHARLES J. JESUIT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANETTE TARAYA-VONK
Represented By: RICHARD M. OCHROCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN VONK
Represented By: RICHARD M. OCHROCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?