WILSON v. INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC.

Plaintiff: SHELBY WILSON
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02198
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Referring Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/6/19. 6/6/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHELBY WILSON. INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by NEELIMA VANGURI on behalf of INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(VANGURI, NEELIMA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY L. GOLD on behalf of INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(GOLD, SIDNEY)
May 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHELBY WILSON. (ahf)
May 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/22/2019 (ahf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197686.), filed by SHELBY WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY WILSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MACEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL CLEANING GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SIDNEY L. GOLD
Represented By: NEELIMA VANGURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?