JAIN et al v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SUDHA JAIN, SUE JAIN and TIKAM C. JAIN
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02199
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY Brief in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(EVERY, GARY) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lisad, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SUDHA JAIN, TIKAM C. JAIN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, PAUL)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3D BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 6/26/2019. 6/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2019. (sg, ) Modified on 6/27/2019 (lisad, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Memorandum, #11 Certificate of Service)(EVERY, GARY)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/26/2019 09:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 6/20/2019. 6/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE P. HART FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/7/2020 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/18/2019. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 11/8/2019. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/6/2019. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/1/2019. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2019. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/9/2020 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/18/2019. 6/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/13/2019.6/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by TIKAM C. JAIN, SUDHA JAIN.(sg, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING by SUDHA JAIN, TIKAM C. JAIN. (PETERS, PAUL) Modified on 6/12/2019 (afm, ).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO FOR 6/18/2019 02:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/4/2019. 6/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Certificate of Service)(EVERY, GARY)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/18/19 AT 9:00 A.M. IN ROOM 9614; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/22/19. 5/22/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by GARY M. EVERY, II on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY(EVERY, GARY)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL S. PETERS, III on behalf of SUDHA JAIN, TIKAM C. JAIN (PETERS, PAUL)
May 21, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY from Common Pleas Chester County, case number 2017-11375-CT. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197672) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAIN et al v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUDHA JAIN
Represented By: SALVATORE F. BELLO, JR.
Represented By: PAUL S. PETERS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUE JAIN
Represented By: SALVATORE F. BELLO, JR.
Represented By: PAUL S. PETERS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIKAM C. JAIN
Represented By: SALVATORE F. BELLO, JR.
Represented By: PAUL S. PETERS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GARY M. EVERY, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?