TRUESDALE v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: HYKEEM TRUESDALE
Defendant: OFFICER CAITLIN SMITH, OFFICER WILFREDO HERNANDEZ, CAITLIN DONAHUE, OFFICER JONATHAN D'SIGOLY, OFFICER RICHARD ZOOG, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DETECTIVE KENNETH FLEMMING and OFFICER LEO JACKSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv02204
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Re: accepted summons and complaint for CAITLIN SMITH on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by HYKEEM TRUESDALE as to CAITLIN SMITH. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Nadia Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon WILFREDO HERNANDEZ by Personal. WILFREDO HERNANDEZ served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Naida Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon LEO JACKSON by Personal. LEO JACKSON served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Nadia Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon KENNETH FLEMMING by Personal. KENNETH FLEMMING served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Nadia Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon RICHARD ZOOG by Personal. RICHARD ZOOG served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Nadia Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon JONATHAN D'SIGOLY by Personal. JONATHAN D'SIGOLY served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE re: Nadia Tursi served Summons and Complaint upon CITY OF PHILADELPHIA by Personal. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/29/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JONATHAN D'SIGOLY, KENNETH FLEMMING, WILFREDO HERNANDEZ, LEO JACKSON, CAITLIN SMITH, RICHARD ZOOG.(ZABEL, SHANNON)
May 21, 2019 7 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JONATHAN D'SIGOLY, KENNETH FLEMMING, WILFREDO HERNANDEZ, LEO JACKSON, CAITLIN SMITH, RICHARD ZOOG. Forwarded To: Kevin P. O'Brien on 5/21/19 (fdc, ) Modified on 5/22/2019 (lisad, ).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JONATHAN D'SIGOLY, KENNETH FLEMMING, WILFREDO HERNANDEZ, LEO JACKSON, CAITLIN SMITH, RICHARD ZOOG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197681.), filed by HYKEEM TRUESDALE. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUESDALE v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CAITLIN SMITH
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER WILFREDO HERNANDEZ
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAITLIN DONAHUE
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JONATHAN D'SIGOLY
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER RICHARD ZOOG
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE KENNETH FLEMMING
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LEO JACKSON
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYKEEM TRUESDALE
Represented By: KEVIN P. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?