RANDOLPH v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV
Defendant: SUPT. FERGUSON, SUPT. GILMORE, DEPUTY DIALASANDRO, CO ELLERBEE, DR. HANICEK, T.A. LEWIS, DR. SARAH, JOHN MCANANY, DEPUTY TERRA, MR. T. FAIRBER, DEPUTY SORBER, DR. LAWRENCE ALPERT, DEPUTY ZAKEN, CO JORDAN, NURSE PAUL, HARRY CANCELMI, MR. FUNK, NURSE DENNIS, WILLIAM NICHOLSON, (3) JANE/JOHN DOE NURSES, MIKE HICE, LT RIDGELY, CO KARNIZAN, DR. DENISE SMYTH, MAJOR CARO, CO FEATHER, CO MCKEVITTS, CO BRANDT, MAJOR TERRA, MS. RIDINGS, CO BELADOR, SGT. MOYER, CO SMOTHERS, JOHN WETZEL, (5) MEMBER CERT TEAM FROM, LT. TROUT, DR. WEINER, MS. GENE WALSH, CO POLICKI, CO MS. JOHNSON, BRUCE POKOL and MR. T. FAUBER
Case Number: 2:2019cv02231
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPIERIS IS GRANTED; PLAINTFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTNEDENT OF SCI PHOENIX; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A NEW CIVIL ACTION USING A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT FILED IN THIS ACTION NAMING RANDOLPH AS THE SOLE PLAINTIFF AND NAMING THE DEFENDANTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN; THIS NEW CIVIL ACTION SHALL BE ASIGNED TO THE UNDERSIGNED ; ONCE THE NEW ACTION IS OPENED THE COURT WILL ENTER AN ORDER TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN; FOR THE REASONS STATE DSIN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAISNT DEFENDANT JOHN WETZEL AND SCI PHOENIX ARE DISMISSED WTIHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH THE EXCEPTION OF THE FOLLOWING CLAIMS OUTLINED HEREIN; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE THE DEFENDANTS OUTLINED HEREIN BECAUSE ALL THE CLAIMS AGAINST THEM HAVE BEEN DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT THIS TIME; PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN THRIRTY (30) DAYS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLANT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT; IF PETITIONER DOES NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE COURT WILL DIRECT SERVICE OF HIS INITIAL COMPLAINT ON THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS OUTLINTED HEREIN; PLAINTIFF MAY ALSO NOTIFY THE COURT OF HIS INTENTION TO PROCEED ON THESE CLAIMS RATHERN THAN FILE ANDED COMPLAINT; IF PLAINTIFF FILES SUCH A NOTICE HE IS REMINDED TO INCLUDE THE CASE NUMBER 19-CV-2231 ON THE NOTICE; THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINIG ORDER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/21/19. 6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AND FAXED TO SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI PHOENIX.(jpd, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/21/19. 6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/26/2019) (md, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbh, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SAMUEL B. RANDOLP,IV'S #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/28/19.5/28/19 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO RANDOLPH. (fdc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV.Declaration.(jwl, )
May 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV. (jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against (3) JANE/JOHN DOE NURSES, (5) MEMBER CERT TEAM FROM 5-5-17, (5) MEMBER CERT TEAM FROM 5-7-19, LAWRENCE ALPERT, BELADOR, BRANDT, HARRY CANCELMI, CARO, DENNIS, DIALASANDRO, ELLERBEE, T. FAIRBER, FEATHER, FERGUSON, FUNK, GILMORE, HANICEK, MIKE HICE, JOHNSON, JORDAN, KARNIZAN, T.A. LEWIS, JOHN MCANANY, MCKEVITTS, MOYER, WILLIAM NICHOLSON, PAUL, BRUCE POKOL, POLICKI, RIDGELY, RIDINGS, SARAH, SMOTHERS, DENISE SMYTH, SORBER, TERRA, TERRA, TROUT, GENE WALSH, WEINER, JOHN WETZEL, ZAKEN, filed by SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) Modified on 5/23/2019 (md). (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/23/2019) (md, ). (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jwl, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RANDOLPH v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPT. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPT. GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY DIALASANDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO ELLERBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. HANICEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SARAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCANANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY TERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. T. FAIRBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY SORBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LAWRENCE ALPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY CANCELMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. FUNK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM NICHOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (3) JANE/JOHN DOE NURSES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT RIDGELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO KARNIZAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. DENISE SMYTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO FEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO MCKEVITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO BRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR TERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. RIDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO BELADOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. MOYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO SMOTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (5) MEMBER CERT TEAM FROM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. TROUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. GENE WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO POLICKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO MS. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE POKOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. T. FAUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL B. RANDOLPH, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?