GRIFFIN v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: JOHN GRIFFIN
Defendant: JUANITA J. WILCOX, JOHN E. WETZEL and TAMMY FERGUSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv02232
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. #7 ) IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL BE PERMITTED AN OPPORTUNITY TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 7/31/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF 5/29/2019 ARE VACATED TO THE EXTENT THAT THEY DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE, RAHTER THAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO REOPEN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/26/2019.6/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 6/3/19 from Pro Se Plaintiff to Chambers, re: #6 Order. (va, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 JOHN GRIFFIN MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND/OR TO VACATE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 59 AND 60 (B)(6)..(jl, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP. JOHN GIRFFIN SHALL PAY FULL $350 FEE IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI PHOENIX. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/29/19. 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE & SUPERINTENDENT.(va, ) (VACATED PER ORDER #9) Modified on 7/2/2019 (md).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/29/19. 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE & SUPERINTENDENT. (va, ) . (VACATED PER ORDER #9) Modified on 7/2/2019 (md).
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOHN GRIFFIN. (ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against TAMMY FERGUSON, JOHN E. WETZEL, JUANITA J. WILCOX, filed by JOHN GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JOHN GRIFFIN.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUANITA J. WILCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?