DOIEL v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: SABRINA DOIEL
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 2:2019cv02236
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 06/28/2019. 06/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SABRINA DOIEL. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (PARKER, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/23/2019 (ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197768.), filed by SABRINA DOIEL.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOIEL v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA DOIEL
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?