MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02244
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 06/28/2019. 06/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTNIFF'S #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/20/19.6/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum re #4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Exhibit) (mbh, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(mbh, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197791) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?