LIGATO et al v. RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC.
Plaintiff: D & T TRANSPORT SERVICES, LLC, DONNA BUSILLO and THERESA LIGATO
Defendant: RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02345
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND COUNT III, IV, AND V ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/16/19. 7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/16/19. 7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS III, IV AND V OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(FIELD, OWEN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DONNA BUSILLO, D & T TRANSPORT SERVICES, LLC, THERESA LIGATO. (MELCHIORRE, VINCENT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS III, IV, AND V OF COMPLAINT filed by RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC. Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SHEINEN, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/7/2019 (tjd).
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by VINCENT N. MELCHIORRE on behalf of D & T TRANSPORT SERVICES, LLC, THERESA LIGATO(MELCHIORRE, VINCENT)
May 30, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent RYDER SYSTEM, INC. for RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC.. by RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC..(jwl, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC. from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 190403320. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198091) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIGATO et al v. RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D & T TRANSPORT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: VINCENT N. MELCHIORRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA BUSILLO
Represented By: VINCENT N. MELCHIORRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA LIGATO
Represented By: VINCENT N. MELCHIORRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYDER USED VEHICLE SALES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN A. SHEINEN
Represented By: OWEN FIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?