HILFERTY v. INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.
Plaintiff: SHARON HILFERTY
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02539
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/31/2019 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 8/8/2019. 8/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/23/2020 08:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY., DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/25/2019., DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 11/4/2019., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 1/3/2020., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/4/2019., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/18/2019., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/18/2019., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/29/2020 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/7/2019. 8/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/7/2019 (sg, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.. (HYMAN, GREGORY)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/7/2019 08:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/23/2019. 7/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HYMAN, GREGORY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC B. CYTRYN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CYTRYN, MARC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC..(HYMAN, GREGORY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. HYMAN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HYMAN, GREGORY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHARON HILFERTY. INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC. waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW)
June 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHARON HILFERTY. (jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/12/19 (jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198811.), filed by SHARON HILFERTY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILFERTY v. INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY S. HYMAN
Represented By: MARC B. CYTRYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON HILFERTY
Represented By: ANDREW S. ABRAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?