NGUYEN v. COMMONWEALTH OF PA et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN NGUYEN
Defendant: THE PA HUMAN RELATION COMMISSION, COMMONWEALTH OF PA and THE COMMONWEALTH COURT
Case Number: 2:2019cv02551
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE ORDER FOR DISMISS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE ORDER TO DISMISS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LEAVE TO FILE MTOION FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/8/19.8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF SUSAN NGUYEN'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE ORDER TO DISMISS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY. (ENVELOPE NOT PROVIDED) (fdc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE ORDER TO DISMISS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY, FILED BY SUSAN NGUYEN.(amas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/29/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO NGUYEN.(rf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/29/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF SUSAN NGUYEN.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Part 1, #2 Exhibit - Part 2, #3 Exhibit - Part 3)(kw, ) "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, ).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND NGUYEN AN APPROPRIATE NON PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/14/19. 6/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO NGUYEN. *APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SENT TO NGUYEN*(rf, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Employment panel description and request for appointment of attorney form mailed to pro se plaintiff(jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH OF PA, THE COMMONWEALTH COURT, THE PA HUMAN RELATION COMMISSION, filed by SUSAN NGUYEN. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by SUSAN NGUYEN..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGUYEN v. COMMONWEALTH OF PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PA HUMAN RELATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COMMONWEALTH COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN NGUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?