HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. v. BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC.
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Defendant: BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02558
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Default Entered (amas)
July 23, 2019 DEFAULT BY BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (amas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Default HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. against BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KILGANNON, JOHN) Modified on 7/23/2019 (nd, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. re: Nationwide Legal LLC served Summons and Complaint upon BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC. by personal service on defendant. BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(KILGANNON, JOHN) Modified on 7/11/2019 (tjd).
June 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.(fdc)
June 11, 2019 One (1) Summons Issued as to BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC. Forwarded To: John C. Kilgannon on 6/11/19. (fdc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198847.), filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. v. BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. KILGANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHALTO CARE CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?