MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Plaintiff: MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Defendant: TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02580
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Gregrory H. Chertoff, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13726144.) filed by TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(EDELSTEIN, STANLEY)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR TUESDAY, 8/27/19 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/7/19. 8/7/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION #5 TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT #1 IS DENIED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #1 NO LATER THAN 8/21/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/7/19.8/7/19 ENTERED & EMAILED.(fdc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Oral Argument On Pending Motion to Dismiss, or the in alternative for Summary Judgment (Doc. 5) by MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (BELL, COLIN)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (EDELSTEIN, STANLEY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BELL, COLIN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by COLIN G BELL on behalf of MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (BELL, COLIN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY.Memorandum, Brief, Appendix, Separate Statement of Undisputed Materail Facts, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Supplement)(EDELSTEIN, STANLEY)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #1 NO LATER THAN 7/15/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/8/19. 7/8/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STANLEY B. EDELSTEIN on behalf of TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY with Certificate of Service(EDELSTEIN, STANLEY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ivann Gregg re: served Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Track Designation Form and Cover Letter upon Turner Construction Company by personal on June 19, 2019 (PALLADINO, JOHN)
June 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (fdc)
June 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. Forwarded To: John F. Palladino on 6/13/19. (fdc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189912.), filed by MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: STANLEY B. EDELSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN F. PALLADINO
Represented By: COLIN G BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?