THREATT v. ADDISON GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MATU THREATT
Defendant: ELISHA THOMPSON, ADDISON GROUP, INC. and ERIC KLEIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv02588
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by ELISHA THOMPSON.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ADDISON GROUP, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of ADDISON GROUP, INC., ERIC KLEIN, ELISHA THOMPSON with Certificate of Service(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MATU THREATT re: Robert Campbell served Summons and Complaint upon ELISHA THOMPSON by Personal Service. ELISHA THOMPSON served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATU THREATT. ERIC KLEIN waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATU THREATT. ADDISON GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
June 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MATU THREATT. (jl, )
June 14, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ADDISON GROUP, INC., ERIC KLEIN, ELISHA THOMPSON. Forwarded To: CATHERINE W. SMITH on 6/14/19 (jl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADDISON GROUP, INC., ERIC KLEIN, ELISHA THOMPSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE198931.), filed by MATU THREATT, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THREATT v. ADDISON GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISHA THOMPSON
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDISON GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC KLEIN
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATU THREATT
Represented By: CATHERINE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?