RACZ et al v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: LESLIE RACZ and JAMES RACZ
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02591
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Richard Seidel by SCOTT R. GALLANT on behalf of JAMES RACZ, LESLIE RACZ. (GALLANT, SCOTT) (ATTY TO REFILE IN HARD COPY) Modified on 8/5/2019 (md).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 2/24/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(jwl, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Pretrial Conference held on 7/24/19. (rf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS MATTER IS HEREBY REFERRED TO ARBITRATION, A HEARING SHALL BE SET FOR FEBRUARY 24, 2020. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE SUBMITTED BY NOVEMBER 1, 2019 AND EXPERT SHALL BE SUBMITTED BY DECEMBER 2, 2019. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY JANUARY 2 2020; ALL PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY FEBRUARY 3, 2020; AND, THIS CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THIS COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON FEBRUARY 24, 2020, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/24/2019. 07/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. **COPY FORWARDED TO THE ARBITRATION CLERK**(nds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on July 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers - Room 15614 before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KERNS, LAURA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (CARLOS, PAMELA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(jaa, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190203092. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198936)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RACZ et al v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE RACZ
Represented By: SCOTT R. GALLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES RACZ
Represented By: SCOTT R. GALLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA E. KERNS
Represented By: PAMELA A. CARLOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?