ARCARE, INC. v. DUCHESNAY USA
Plaintiff: ARCARE, INC.
Defendant: DUCHESNAY USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02593
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/19/19 AT 3:30 PM IN COURTROOM 14B BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/25/19. 7/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by DUCHESNAY USA. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(HADGIS, KRISTIN) Modified on 7/22/2019 (tjd).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RANDALL PULLIAM TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/16/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EDWIN "LEE" LOWTHER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/16/19.7/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO LOWTHER. (fdc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Randall K. Pulliam by ARCARE, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13672157.). (GRUNFELD, KENNETH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Edwin "Lee" Lowther ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13672081.) filed by ARCARE, INC...(GRUNFELD, KENNETH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT, #2 COMPLAINT, #3 STATEMENT, #4 PRAECIPE, #5 SERVED, #6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, #7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #8 PAPERS FWD)(amas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/9/19. 7/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED LETTER REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS DUE JULY 19, 2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO 7/5/2019 TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/21/2019. 6/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN M. HADGIS on behalf of DUCHESNAY USA with Certificate of Service(HADGIS, KRISTIN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (GRUNFELD, KENNETH)
June 14, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(amas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent 9249-5746 QUEBEC INC. for DUCHESNAY USA. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DUCHESNAY USA.(amas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DUCHESNAY USA from MONTGOMERY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 19-06950. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198939) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCARE, INC. v. DUCHESNAY USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUCHESNAY USA
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Represented By: KRISTIN M. HADGIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCARE, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Represented By: RANDALL K PULLIAM
Represented By: EDWIN LEE LOWTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?