CELANI v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SUSAN CELANI
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02596
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE LYNNE A. SITARSKI WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN 1/23/20. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 2/24/20. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD NON 2/13/20 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/18/19 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/24/19. 7/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/23/19 before Judge Surrick (mbh, ) Modified on 7/26/2019 (mbh, ). (DUPLICATE FILING - SEE #7)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/23/19 before Judge Surrick. (mbh, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/26/2019 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 7/23/2019 04:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE WITH THE COURT A WRITTEN JOINT CASE REPORT NO LATER THAN MONDAY, 7/22/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/18/2019. 7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Report Of Joint Case Report by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MEINDL, KRISTINE)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRTIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/26/2019 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/12/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with to Complaint by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MEINDL, KRISTINE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (MEINDL, KRISTINE)
June 14, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: counsel on 6/14/19. (kw, )
June 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF SUSAN CELANI. (kw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE198946.), filed by SUSAN CELANI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELANI v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN CELANI
Represented By: JAMES GUNDLACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?