HAMILTON v. RADNOR TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: KARIMU HAMILTON
Defendant: RADNOR TOWNSHIP, RADNOR TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, RADNOR TOWNSHIP DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, KEVIN KOCHANSKI, CHRISTOPHER B. FLANAGAN, RACHEL RIDGEWAY, JUSTIN RIDGEWAY, ANDREW PANCOAST and RADNOR POLICE OFFICERS NOS. 1, 2, 3 4 AND 5
Case Number: 2:2019cv02599
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 5 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER B. FLANAGAN, KEVIN KOCHANSKI, ANDREW PANCOAST, JUSTIN RIDGEWAY, RACHEL RIDGEWAY. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/9/2019 (sg, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER B. FLANAGAN, ANDREW PANCOAST, KEVIN KOCHANSKI, RACHEL RIDGEWAY, JUSTIN RIDGEWAY, RADNOR POLICE OFFICERS NOS. 1, 2, 3 4 AND 5, filed by KARIMU HAMILTON.(sg, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT, AND PLAINTIFF SAHLL COMLY WITH MY 7/16/2019 ORDER (DOC. #10 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/19/2019.7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE COMPLAINT, filed by KARIMU HAMILTON. EXHIBIT. NO ENVELOPE.(sg, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FAILING A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 8/9/2019. PLAINTIFF IS RESPONSIBLE FOR FILING A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 8/9/2019 WHETHER ON HER OWN OR THROUGH COUNSEL. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/16/2019. 7/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO JUDGE GOLDBERG, FROM J. MICHAEL CONSIDINE, JR., RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (sg, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DEEMED FILED. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS THE GOVERNING PLEADING IN THIS CASE, IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PPREJUDICE. HAMILTON IS GIVEN 30 DAYS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. UPON THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND HAMILTON A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM GENERAL COMPLAINT TO BE USED BY A PRO SE PLAINTIFF BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF HAMILTON FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/25/2019. 6/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH BLANK COMPLAINT.(sg, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/25/2019. 6/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT THE PETITION FOR AN EMERGENCY HEARING (DOC. #4 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/20/2019.6/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RADNOR TOWNSHIP, RADNOR TOWNSHIP DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, RADNOR TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by KARIMU HAMILTON. NO ENVELOPE.(sg, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY HEARING, filed by KARIMU HAMILTON. (sg, ) Modified on 6/21/2019 (lisad, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against RADNOR TOWNSHIP, RADNOR TOWNSHIP DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, RADNOR TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by KARIMU HAMILTON. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by KARIMU HAMILTON..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMILTON v. RADNOR TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADNOR TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADNOR TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADNOR TOWNSHIP DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN KOCHANSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER B. FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL RIDGEWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN RIDGEWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW PANCOAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADNOR POLICE OFFICERS NOS. 1, 2, 3 4 AND 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARIMU HAMILTON
Represented By: J. MICHAEL CONSIDINE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?