WADHWA v. WILKE
Plaintiff: DOM WADHWA
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02609
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 9/19/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/14/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance Kevin I. Lovitz by DOM WADHWA. (LOVITZ, KEVIN)
July 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO REQUEST TO LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENT TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, filed by DOM WADHWA. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBIT.(sg, ) Modified on 7/16/2019 (lisad, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DOM WADHWAMD. Summons and Complaint served upon Office of United States Attorney for ROBERT WILKIE by Personal Service on 6/19/19. (sg, ) No envelope included. Modified on 6/21/2019 (lisad, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to ROBERT WILKIE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Two given To: Pro se plaintiff, one given to AUSA on 6/17/19 (jwl, ) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jwl, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198976.), filed by DOM WADHWA. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, ) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WADHWA v. WILKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOM WADHWA
Represented By: KEVIN I. LOVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?