PORTNOY v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARSHA PORTNOY
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, COMENITY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02628
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the complaint. (amas)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT COMENITY BANK SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/20/2019 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET THE ATTACHED STIPULATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/13/2019. 8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 8/12/2019, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/19/2019. 7/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #11 ) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT COMENITY BANK SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 7/26/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/12/2019.7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by COMENITY BANK.Certificate of Service.(DEFEO, MARISA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISA RACHEL DEFEO on behalf of COMENITY BANK with Certificate of Service(DEFEO, MARISA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(JONES, ERIK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ERIK J. JONES, ESQUIRE, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/28/2019. 6/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARSHA PORTNOY re: Christopher Todd Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Jones, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13634385.). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(GREEN, CASEY)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARSHA PORTNOY re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARSHA PORTNOY. (ahf)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/18/2019 (ahf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13612454.), filed by MARSHA PORTNOY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTNOY v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN D. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMENITY BANK
Represented By: MARISA RACHEL DEFEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: ERIK J. JONES
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHA PORTNOY
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?