BEHERNS et al v. ARCONIC, INC.
Plaintiff: ALK HAXHISEFA, PAULOS TEKLE, HANIFE MACIT, MARCO GOTTARDI, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, SHANTILAL PATEL, JOSEPH DANIELS, RABIA YAHYA, LINA HAMIDE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, VICTORIA KING, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ, HOANG KHANH QUANG, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, JOSE COSTA COTELO, AMINA MOHAMED, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, RANIA IBRAHIM, MERON MEKONNEN, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, MILAD KAREEM, OMAR BELKADI, VINCENT CHIEJINA, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, MARYAM ADAM, AMNA MOHAMED, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, ZAINAB DEEN, CHIRAAG PATEL, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, MUSTAFA ABDU, SIED BAYAN, MOHAMED AHMED, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, KAREN BOUD, NADIA YOUSEF, NADIA CHOUCAIR, ALEXANDRA ATALA, ANN CHANCE, SHARON LACI, MARY MENDY, ERNIE VITAL, NURA JEMAL, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, ELISA RABAYA, JOSE VIEIRO, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, RHEA ROJO, MAKREM HARZI, MERON ARAYA, REBIN SABIR, MALAK BELKADI, ROY SMITH, NATASHA ELCOCK, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATIMA JAFARI, DAVID LEWIS, LEE CHAPMAN, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, DENIS MURPHY, SENER MACIT, MARY HANLEY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, KRISTEN BEHERNS, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, MUNIRA MAHMUD, SAM DANIELS, MARIA JAFARI, DANIEL GRIFFIN, JOSEPH JOHN, ABRAHAM ABEBE, JEREMIAH DEEN, ANTHONY SMITH, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MOHAMMED RASOUL, NICHOLAS BURTON, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, SUZANA LOVSIN, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMMED HANIF, KAMRU MIAH, ALISON MOSES, STEVEN POWER, INES TAVARES ALVES, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, BIRUK HAFTOM, FIRDAWS HASHIM, MONICA LOKKO, BETTY KASOTE, GITARA PAHLAVANI, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, BRANISLAV LUKIC, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, FETHIA HASSAN, MIRAN LOVSIN, MOHAMMED HAMID, AMAYA AHMEDIN, AMAL AHMEDIN, YAHYA HASHIM, FADUMO AHMED, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, YAQUB HASHIM, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, FARAH HAMDAN, WINTOM TEMESGEN, LIGAYA MOORE, HANIA HASSAN, AVNI HAXHISEFA, LEENA BELKADI, LEROY AUGUSTUS, RAYMOND BERNARD, ISSAC PAULOS, ANTHONY DISSON, GLORIA TREVISAN, KERRY O'HARA, RICHARD FLETCHER, TIAGO ALVES, WESLEY IGNACIO, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, NADIA JAFARI, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, MARJORIE VITAL, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, HASHIM KEDIR, EDUARDO IGNACIO, PETRA DOULOVA, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LUKE TOWNER, WILLIAM THOMSON, AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, HAMID KANI, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, GARY MAUNDERS, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, KIRAN PATEL, SHARON HALEY, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, EDWARD DAFFARN, RAWDA SAID, BERKTI HAFTOM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, HANAN WAHABI, HUSNA BEGUM, JOHN BEADLE, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, ERLINDA IGNACIO, SABAH ABDULLAH, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, SHEILA SMITH, KHALID AHMED, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, CATHERINE HANLEY, OCTINIA LEWIS, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, CORRINE JONES, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, AZIZA RAIHANI, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, GENET SHAWO, SAFA HAMDAN, ROSITA BONIFACIO, YASIN EL-WAHABI, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, CARMEN VIEIRO, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, YOHANNES TESFAY, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANDA AL-ARASI, REBECCA ROSS, ELSA AFEWORKI, MARCIO GOMES, HIME GASHAW, VAN QUANG HO, LOGAN GOMES, MADYLYN IGNACIO, CLARITA GHAVIMI, RITA TANKARIAN, KHADIJA SAYE and FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK
Defendant: ARCONIC, INC., ALCOA INC, SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, ABC CORPORATIONS (1-99), WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION, XYZ CORPORATIONS (1-99), ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC and JOHN DOES (1-99)
Case Number: 2:2019cv02664
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #45 Transcript - PDF,, 7/25/19 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (fdc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/17/19, before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber: WRITER'S CRAMP, INC.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (fdc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF ABIGAIL M. HINCHCLIFF, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/24/19.7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Abigail M. Hinchcliff ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13683622.) filed by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #26 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/19/19.7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP. (fdc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 47 Audio File 07/17/2019 02:04:03pm, regarding rule 16 conference held on 07/17/2019, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (ked, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Rule 16 Hearing held on 07/17/2019. (nd, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT RESPONSES TO THE COMPLAINT WHICH WILL LIKELY BE RULE 12 MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 8/29/19. DISCOVERY REQUESTS ARE DUE BY 9/16/19. ANY MOTION RELATING TO DISCOVERY ARE DUE NO LATER THAN 9/30/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/17/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(jl, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MATTHEW E. PAPEZ, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/15/19.7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 7/16/19 (kw, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF STEPHEN J. PEARSON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/15/19.7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 7/16/19 (kw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 37 JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY) Modified on 7/16/2019 (lisad, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 36 RULE 16 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, ALCOA INC., MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Protocol, #3 Exhibit C - Discovery to Arconic, #4 Exhibit D - Discovery to Celotex, #5 Exhibit E - Discovery to Whirlpool)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT) Modified on 7/16/2019 (lisad, ).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOHN E. TANGREN (ECF NO. #30 ) FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 07/15/2019.07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ADAM J. LEVITT (ECF NO. #29 ) FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 07/15/2019.07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARK A. DICELLO (ECF NO. #28 ) FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 07/15/2019.07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) (nd, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 (FEE RECEIVED 7/12/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen J. Pearson filed by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(DEJULIUS, LEON) Modified on 7/15/2019 (amas).
July 12, 2019 Filing 31 (FEE RECEIVED 7/12/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew E. Papez filed by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(DEJULIUS, LEON) Modified on 7/15/2019 (amas).
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for John E. Tangren ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13666041.) filed by AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ.Certificate of Service.(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Adam J. Levitt ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13665990.) filed by AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ.Certificate of Service.(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Mark A. DiCello ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13665867.) filed by AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ.Certificate of Service.(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re #26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand filed by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC., WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY) Modified on 7/2/2019 (lisad, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand filed by KRISTEN BEHERNS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION (ECF NO. #22 ) FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RACHEL PASSARETTI-WU IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 06/26/2019.06/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITH ECF APP AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION (ECF NO. #23 ) FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LINCOLN D. WILSON IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 06/26/2019.06/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Lincoln D. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13634126.) filed by SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(LEONE, JUDY)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Rachel Passaretti-Wu ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13634091.) filed by SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(LEONE, JUDY)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MARK S. CHEFFO, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/25/19.6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY. (kw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL B. DORDICK on behalf of AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. GOODMAN on behalf of AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL, MUSTAFA ABDU, ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID, SABAH ABDULLAH, ABRAHAM ABEBE, MARYAM ADAM, ELSA AFEWORKI, FATEMEH AFRASEHABI, SAKIN AFRASEHABI, FADUMO AHMED, KHALID AHMED, MOHAMED AHMED, AMAL AHMEDIN, AMAYA AHMEDIN, RANDA AL-ARASI, MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI, OMAR ALHAJ ALI, INES TAVARES ALVES, MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES, MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES, TIAGO ALVES, MERON ARAYA, ETHIOPIA ASSEFA, ALEXANDRA ATALA, LEROY AUGUSTUS, SIED BAYAN, JOHN BEADLE, HUSNA BEGUM, KRISTEN BEHERNS, LEENA BELKADI, MALAK BELKADI, OMAR BELKADI, RAYMOND BERNARD, ELPIDIO BONIFACIO, ROSITA BONIFACIO, KAREN BOUD, MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON, NICHOLAS BURTON, VIRGILIO CASTRO, ANN CHANCE, DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS, LEE CHAPMAN, SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI, ZAK CHEBIOUNI, FUNG-HEE CHENUNG, VINCENT CHIEJINA, BASSEM CHOUCAIR, FATIMA CHOUCAIR, MIERNA CHOUCAIR, NADIA CHOUCAIR, SIRRIA CHOUCAIR, ZEINAB CHOUCAIR, JOSE COSTA COTELO, KATARZYNA DABROWSKA, EDWARD DAFFARN, HIWOT DAGNACHEW, JOSEPH DANIELS, SAM DANIELS, JEREMIAH DEEN, ZAINAB DEEN, ALEMISHET DEMISSIE, ANTHONY DISSON, PETRA DOULOVA, BELLAL EL-GUENUNI, MOUNA EL-OGBANI, ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI, FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI, MEHDI EL-WAHABI, NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI, YASIN EL-WAHABI, NATASHA ELCOCK, ESLAH ELGWAHRY, MARIEM ELGWAHRY, FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI, YEHUALASHET ENYEW, RICHARD FLETCHER, HIME GASHAW, HELEN GEBREMESKEL, CLARITA GHAVIMI, TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA, LOGAN GOMES, MARCIO GOMES, MARCO GOTTARDI, CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE, DANIEL GRIFFIN, BERKTI HAFTOM, BIRUK HAFTOM, SHARON HALEY, FARAH HAMDAN, SAFA HAMDAN, MOHAMMED HAMID, LINA HAMIDE, MOHAMMED HANIF, CATHERINE HANLEY, MARY HANLEY, MAKREM HARZI, FIRDAWS HASHIM, YAHYA HASHIM, YAQUB HASHIM, FETHIA HASSAN, HANIA HASSAN, ALK HAXHISEFA, AVNI HAXHISEFA, ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI, SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI, VAN QUANG HO, ABUFARS IBRAHIM, ISRA IBRAHIM, RANIA IBRAHIM, AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS, EDUARDO IGNACIO, ERLINDA IGNACIO, MADYLYN IGNACIO, WESLEY IGNACIO, ALI YAWAR JAFARI, FATIMA JAFARI, MARIA JAFARI, NADIA JAFARI, NURA JEMAL, JOSEPH JOHN, CORRINE JONES, FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI, HAMID KANI, MILAD KAREEM, BETTY KASOTE, MESROB KASSEMDJIAN, BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE, HASHIM KEDIR, YOUSSEF KHALLOUD, KHADIJA KHALLOUFI, VICTORIA KING, SHARON LACI, DEBORAH LAMPRELL, DAVID LEWIS, OCTINIA LEWIS, CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI, CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO, MONICA LOKKO, MIRAN LOVSIN, SUZANA LOVSIN, BRANISLAV LUKIC, HANIFE MACIT, SENER MACIT, MUNIRA MAHMUD, GARY MAUNDERS, MERON MEKONNEN, MARY MENDY, KAMRU MIAH, SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM, AMINA MOHAMED, AMNA MOHAMED, LIGAYA MOORE, ALISON MOSES, DENIS MURPHY, NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO, RESHAD NAQSHBANDI, FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA, MOHAMED AMIED NEDA, SHAKILA FLORA NEDA, EMMA O'CONNOR, KERRY O'HARA, GITARA PAHLAVANI, MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN, CHIRAAG PATEL, KIRAN PATEL, SHANTILAL PATEL, ISSAC PAULOS, ANDREIA PERESTRELO, STEVEN POWER, HOANG KHANH QUANG, ELISA RABAYA, AZIZA RAIHANI, ADRIANA RAMIREZ, JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ, MOHAMMED RASOUL, RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ, RHEA ROJO, ANTONIO RONCOLATO, REBECCA ROSS, REBIN SABIR, RAWDA SAID, KHADIJA SAYE, GENET SHAWO, ANTHONY SMITH, ROY SMITH, SHEILA SMITH, FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK, ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK, MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK, ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND, WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND, CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND, RITA TANKARIAN, PAULOS TEKLE, WINTOM TEMESGEN, YOHANNES TESFAY, WILLIAM THOMSON, LUKE TOWNER, MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS, GLORIA TREVISAN, MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU, CARMEN VIEIRO, JOSE VIEIRO, ERNIE VITAL, MARJORIE VITAL, HANAN WAHABI, RABIA YAHYA, NADIA YOUSEF, ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ (GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Mark S. Cheffo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13628104.) filed by SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(LEONE, JUDY)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' OPPOSED #12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO 7/30/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/24/19.6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/17/19 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3A BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/24/19. 6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by KRISTEN BEHERNS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Opposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.(DEJULIUS, LEON)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LEON F. DEJULIUS, JR on behalf of WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DEJULIUS, LEON)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC..Memorandum of Law; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC.(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ARCONIC, INC..(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ILANA H. EISENSTEIN on behalf of ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC. with Certificate of Service(EISENSTEIN, ILANA)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SEAN C. GRIMSLEY TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/24/19.6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lisad, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JASON C. MURRAY TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/24/19. 6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(lisad, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jason C. Murray ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13620804.) filed by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sean C. Grimsley ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13620774.) filed by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH KERNEN on behalf of ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC. with Certificate of Service(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent COMPAGNIE DE SAINT-GOBAIN, Corporate Parent SOCIETE DE PARTICIPATIONS FINANCIERES ET INDUSTRIELLES for SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION.(rf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (rf, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 DEFENDANT SAINT-GOBAN CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(rf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, ARCONIC, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190605311. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE199160), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 ex 1, #2 ex 1 part 2, #3 ex 1 part 3, #4 ex 2, #5 ex 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Case Management Track Form, #8 Designation Form, #9 Certificate of Service)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEHERNS et al v. ARCONIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALK HAXHISEFA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULOS TEKLE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANIFE MACIT
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCO GOTTARDI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATARZYNA DABROWSKA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEPIDEH MINAEI MOGHADDAM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIA-YUAN NAOMI LI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANTILAL PATEL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DANIELS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RABIA YAHYA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINA HAMIDE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MESROB KASSEMDJIAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA KING
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANA ZYMBERAJ
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOANG KHANH QUANG
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORINDA SUAREZ CHANS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE COSTA COTELO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMINA MOHAMED
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL MIGUEL ALVES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANIA IBRAHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERON MEKONNEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEHDI EL-WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAKIN AFRASEHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILAD KAREEM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR BELKADI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT CHIEJINA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMIRO URBANO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIRRIA CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAEWTA SUPAREOGSANOND
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIWOT DAGNACHEW
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYAM ADAM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMNA MOHAMED
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR ALHAJ ALI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAINAB DEEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIRAAG PATEL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREIA PERESTRELO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUNG-HEE CHENUNG
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHALALAI SUPAROEKSANOND
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUSTAFA ABDU
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIED BAYAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED AHMED
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIN-HSUAN LYDIA LIAO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUHAYB SALAH HIRSI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BOUD
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADIA YOUSEF
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADIA CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRA ATALA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN CHANCE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON LACI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MENDY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNIE VITAL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NURA JEMAL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIERNA CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISA RABAYA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE VIEIRO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DE FATIMA ALVES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHEA ROJO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAKREM HARZI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERON ARAYA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBIN SABIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALAK BELKADI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA ELCOCK
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIEM ELGWAHRY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATIMA JAFARI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LEWIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE CHAPMAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SOBIESZCZAK
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENIS MURPHY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENER MACIT
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HANLEY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATHIA AHMED ELSANOUSI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD ALHAJALI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LAMPRELL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM SUPAREOGSANOND
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI YAWAR JAFARI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN BEHERNS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PARAMASIVAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUNIRA MAHMUD
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM DANIELS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA JAFARI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL GRIFFIN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH JOHN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM ABEBE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMIAH DEEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO RONCOLATO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAOUZIA EL-WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED RASOUL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS BURTON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATIMA CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANA LOVSIN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARSHID KAFICHERAGHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARHAD SHEKEB NEDA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED HANIF
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMRU MIAH
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALISON MOSES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN POWER
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INES TAVARES ALVES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDIRAHMAN SALAH HIRSI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIRUK HAFTOM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRDAWS HASHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA LOKKO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY KASOTE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GITARA PAHLAVANI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABUFARS IBRAHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANISLAV LUKIC
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIKO TOYOSHIMA-LEWIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOUSSEF KHALLOUD
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FETHIA HASSAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRAN LOVSIN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED HAMID
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAYA AHMEDIN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAL AHMEDIN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAHYA HASHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FADUMO AHMED
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESLAH ELGWAHRY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAQUB HASHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEHAILU GOBENA KEBEDE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDUL-WAHAB ABDULHAMID
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARAH HAMDAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINTOM TEMESGEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIGAYA MOORE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANIA HASSAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVNI HAXHISEFA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEENA BELKADI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY AUGUSTUS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND BERNARD
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISSAC PAULOS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DISSON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA TREVISAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY O'HARA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FLETCHER
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIAGO ALVES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY IGNACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHIOPIA ASSEFA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE GREENRIDGE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMEDNUR TUCCU
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADIA JAFARI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASSEM CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARJORIE VITAL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELLAL EL-GUENUNI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASHIM KEDIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO IGNACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETRA DOULOVA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TURUFAT YILMA GIRMA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE TOWNER
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THOMSON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED ABDEL-RASOUL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESHAD NAQSHBANDI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAMID KANI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAGAWA PROSSY NALUKWAGO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY MAUNDERS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YEHUALASHET ENYEW
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NUR HUDA EL-WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRAN PATEL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON HALEY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNA EL-OGBANI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD DAFFARN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAWDA SAID
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKTI HAFTOM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMNA MAHMUD IDRIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANAN WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUSNA BEGUM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BEADLE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATEMEH AFRASEHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERLINDA IGNACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABAH ABDULLAH
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAK CHEBIOUNI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALID AHMED
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEMISHET DEMISSIE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE HANLEY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCTINIA LEWIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA URBANO RAMIREZ
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORRINE JONES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED AMIED NEDA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA O'CONNOR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZIZA RAIHANI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN GEBREMESKEL
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGILIO CASTRO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELPIDIO BONIFACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANA RAMIREZ
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKILA FLORA NEDA
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHADIJA KHALLOUFI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENET SHAWO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFA HAMDAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSITA BONIFACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASIN EL-WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SOBIESZCZAK
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEINAB CHOUCAIR
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DEL PILAR BURTON
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN VIEIRO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDUL AZIZ EL-WAHABI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALAH EDDINE CHEBIOUNI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOHANNES TESFAY
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRA IBRAHIM
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDA AL-ARASI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA ROSS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELSA AFEWORKI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIO GOMES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIME GASHAW
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAN QUANG HO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN GOMES
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADYLYN IGNACIO
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARITA GHAVIMI
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA TANKARIAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHADIJA SAYE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENTYNA SOBIESCZAK
Represented By: ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By: ADAM J. LEVITT
Represented By: JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. TANGREN
Represented By: SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Represented By: MARK A. DICELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCONIC, INC.
Represented By: NANCY SHANE RAPPAPORT
Represented By: JOSEPH KERNEN
Represented By: ABIGAIL M. HINCHCLIFF
Represented By: JASON C. MURRAY
Represented By: SEAN C. GRIMSLEY
Represented By: ILANA H. EISENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION
Represented By: JUDY LEE LEONE
Represented By: RACHEL PASSARETTI-WU
Represented By: LINCOLN D. WILSON
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS (1-99)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: LEON F. DEJULIUS, JR.
Represented By: MATTHEW E. PAPEZ
Represented By: STEPHEN J. PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS (1-99)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCONIC ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: NANCY SHANE RAPPAPORT
Represented By: JOSEPH KERNEN
Represented By: ABIGAIL M. HINCHCLIFF
Represented By: JASON C. MURRAY
Represented By: SEAN C. GRIMSLEY
Represented By: ILANA H. EISENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-99)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?