ROE et al v. LIVENT CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: LARRY ROE
Defendant: PAUL W. GRAVES, GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI, PIERRE R. BRONDEAU, NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER, LIVENT CORPORATION and ANDREA E. UTECHT
Petitioner: LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP, THE PUERTO RICO EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY, YULIANG ZHANG and PENNSYLVANIA FUND GROUP
Case Number: 2:2019cv02683
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by PENNSYLVANIA FUND GROUP of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Lead Plaintiff (MATHEWS, TIMOTHY) Modified on 8/6/2019 (tjd).
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (GIBSON, BARBARA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by LARRY ROE Notice of Non-Opposition of the Livent Group (NELSON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by THE PUERTO RICO EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (LEDERER, LAWRENCE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by YULIANG ZHANG of Non-Opposition and Response (KASKELA, DAVID)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT A RULE IS DIRECTED UPON MOVANTS LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP, LIVENT GROUP, PENNSYLVANIA FUND GROUP, AND YULIANG ZHANG ALONG WITH PLAINTIFF LARRY ROE TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHICH OF THE MOTIONS TO APPOINT COUNSEL AND LEAD PLAINTIFF SHOULD BE GRANTED ANDMOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/23/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/26/19. 7/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN H. CALLAWAY on behalf of GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI, PIERRE R. BRONDEAU, PAUL W. GRAVES, LIVENT CORPORATION, NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER, ANDREA E. UTECHT with Certificate of Service(CALLAWAY, BRIAN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY A. DUBOW on behalf of GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI, PIERRE R. BRONDEAU, PAUL W. GRAVES, LIVENT CORPORATION, NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER, ANDREA E. UTECHT with Certificate of Service(DUBOW, JAY)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Yuliang Zhang) filed by YULIANG ZHANG. Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Certificate of Service)(KASKELA, DAVID) Modified on 7/24/2019 (tjd).
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by THE PUERTO RICO EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Lawrence J. Lederer)(LEDERER, LAWRENCE) Modified on 8/2/2019 (lvj, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Consolidate Cases By Movant Pennsylvania Fund Group filed by PENNSYLVANIA FUND GROUP. Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(DONALDSON SMITH, KIMBERLY) Modified on 7/24/2019 (tjd).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP. Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(NELSON, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 7/24/2019 (tjd).
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(GIBSON, BARBARA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, BARBARA)
June 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LARRY ROE. (fdc, )
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI, PIERRE R. BRONDEAU, PAUL W. GRAVES, LIVENT CORPORATION, NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER, ANDREA E. UTECHT. Forwarded To: Keith Lorenze on 6/20/19 (fdc, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI, PIERRE R. BRONDEAU, PAUL W. GRAVES, LIVENT CORPORATION, NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER, ANDREA E. UTECHT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199219.), filed by LARRY ROE.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROE et al v. LIVENT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL W. GRAVES
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERTO ANTONIAZZI
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIERRE R. BRONDEAU
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS L. PFEIFFER
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIVENT CORPORATION
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA E. UTECHT
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: BRIAN H. CALLAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY ROE
Represented By: KEITH LORENZE
Represented By: TIMOTHY N. MATHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LIVENT INVESTOR GROUP
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. NELSON
Represented By: BARBARA L. GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE PUERTO RICO EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY
Represented By: LAWRENCE J. LEDERER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YULIANG ZHANG
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PENNSYLVANIA FUND GROUP
Represented By: KIMBERLY M. DONALDSON SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?