EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al
Plaintiff: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., MICHAEL MCCLELLAN and KARE SCHULTZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv02711
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Referring Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID R. KAPLAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #9 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David R. Kaplan, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13707282.) filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA.Certificate of Service.(PROMISLOFF, DAVID)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JORDAN D. HERSHMAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/29/19. 7/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jordan D. Hershman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13698099.) filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(SONNENFELD, MARC)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REFER THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION TO THE CHIEF JUDGE OF THIS COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/23/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Reassign Case Uncontested filed by MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(SONNENFELD, MARC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. SONNENFELD on behalf of MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/26/19. 6/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT CLERK SHALL REMOVE THE RELATED CASE DESIGNATION AND REFER THE CASE TO THE CHIEF JUDGE FOR RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/25/19. 6/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 21, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.. Forwarded To: counsel on 6/24/19. (kw, )
June 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (kw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE199283.), filed by EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track)(kw, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2019) (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MCCLELLAN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARE SCHULTZ
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG, FLORIDA
Represented By: DAVID M. PROMISLOFF
Represented By: DAVID R. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?