STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02734
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/21/19. 8/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (ATKIN, JOHN)
August 15, 2019 AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 9/10/2019. (sg, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. #5 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND IT MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 9/10/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/15/2019.8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Within Which To File An Amended Complaint To Add Defendants filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ATKIN, JOHN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF ESTABLISHED "GOOD CAUSE" EXISTS TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPEONA ON VERIZON FIOS. PLAINTIFF MAY AMEND ITS COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS NO LATER THAN 8/15/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum of Law, Declaration(s), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #5 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ATKIN, JOHN)
June 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (jwl, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199362.), filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(jwl, ) (ahf, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2019) (jwl, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2019) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?