ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02791
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PECO ENERGY COMPANY.Memorandum Of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BERNSTEIN, SHARI)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN PART AND DEFENDANT MAY RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 8/16/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/8/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SALMON on behalf of PECO ENERGY COMPANY, with Certificate of Service(SALMON, JOHN) Modified on 8/12/2019 (md).
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Exelon Energy Delivery Company, LLC subsidary of Exelon Corporation with Certificate of Service by PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(BERNSTEIN, SHARI) Modified on 8/12/2019 (md).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARI F. BERNSTEIN on behalf of PECO ENERGY COMPANY, with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BERNSTEIN, SHARI) Modified on 8/12/2019 (md).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Jeffrey Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon PECO ENERGY COMPANY by Personal Service. PECO ENERGY COMPANY served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
July 2, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PECO ENERGY COMPANY forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 7/2/19. (rf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PECO ENERGY COMPANY, filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY., JURY TRIAL DEMAND.(rf, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL NO LATER THAN 7/3/19 EITHER (1) FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PLEADING THE PARTIES' CITIZENSHIP OR (2) SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING 7 PAGES TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS ITS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/26/19. 6/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, )
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to PECO ENERGY COMPANY. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/26/19 (jwl, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PECO ENERGY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13632647.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Represented By: SHARI F. BERNSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN E. SALMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?