IN RE: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and WILLIAM C. MILLER
Debtor In Possession: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv02804
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO RE-INSTATE APPEAL CASE ON DOCKET filed by TARANI A. JOHNSON.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(dmc, ) COPIES MAILED TO TRUSTEE. Modified on 7/19/2019 (dmc, ).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/17/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MILLER, COLEMAN, MCGRATH. COPY FORWARDED TO U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT. (fdc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 BFCOA Counsel of Record)(ahf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of TARANI A. JOHNSON from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Magdeline D. Coleman filed on 5/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Entire Docket and Notice of Appeal and Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Represented By: JOSHUA LOUIS THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?