MONTAGUE v. MONTAGUE
Plaintiff: MR. JAMES ANTHONY MONTAGUE
Defendant: LILIAN VIOLETA MONTAGUE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02898
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/22/2019 (Document # 5) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to LILIAN VIOLETA MONTAGUE for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (amas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER ALLEGED CRIMINAL MATTERS BETWEEN PRIVATE PARTIES. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/1/2019. 8/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREP.(amas)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN UNDEFINED EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS GRANTED TO ALLOW HIM TO FILE A RESPONSE NO LATER THAN 7/29/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/22/2019.7/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREP.(amas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF JAMES A. MONTAGUE FOR EXTENSION OF RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL. (DT) (NO ENVELOPE FILED IN PERSON)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE BY 7/19/2019 AS TO WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/8/2019. 7/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREP.(amas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas, )
July 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES ANTHONY MONTAGUE. (mas, )
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to LILIAN VIOLETA MONTAGUE. 1 Forwarded To: Pro Se Plaintiff on 7/1/19 (mas, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LILIAN VIOLETA MONTAGUE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005162.), filed by JAMES ANTHONY MONTAGUE. No envelope, hand delivered. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 (mas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTAGUE v. MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR. JAMES ANTHONY MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILIAN VIOLETA MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?