UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GIFFIN et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: DEBRA GIFFIN and CARTY GIFFIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv02906
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Default Entered (mbh, )
August 30, 2019 DEFAULT BY CARTY GIFFIN, DEBRA GIFFIN FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Default UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against CARTY GIFFIN, DEBRA GIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin F. Darden, #2 Exhibit A: defendants' military status, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DARDEN, ERIN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Neil Poritsky re: served summons, complaint, designation form, case management track designation form upon Debra Giffin by substitute service on July 25, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of documents served)(DARDEN, ERIN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Neil Poritsky re: served summons, complaint, designation form, case management track designation form upon Carty Giffin by personal service on July 25, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of documents served)(DARDEN, ERIN)
July 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to CARTY GIFFIN, DEBRA GIFFIN. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/3/2019 (ahf)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARTY GIFFIN, DEBRA GIFFIN, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GIFFIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA GIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTY GIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ERIN FAITH DARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?