GRAFENSTINE v. SAUL
Plaintiff: GEORGE GRAFENSTINE
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02931
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Referring Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY TO HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 07/15/2019. 07/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by GEORGE GRAFENSTINE.. (SAVOY, ROBERT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.7/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (rf, )
July 9, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Summons forwarded to US Marshal Service and 1 Summons to US Attorney on 7/9/19. (rf, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FRCP 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 7/9/19. 7/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(jaa, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL filed by GEORGE GRAFENSTINE. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by GEORGE GRAFENSTINE.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAFENSTINE v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE GRAFENSTINE
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?