TONER et al v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD TONER and HENDERIKA TONER
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, BW/IP, INC., CRANE CO., WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INC., GOULDS PUMPS LLC, THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., CBS CORPORATION, A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO., PNEUMO ABEX LLC, FMC CORPORATION, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, PEPBOYS, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02932
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INC., Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service. (NEESON, PETER) Modified on 8/26/2019 (md).
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INC..(NEESON, PETER)
August 21, 2019 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VELAN VALVE CORPORATION.(GREEN, NANCY)
August 21, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY D. GREEN on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(GREEN, NANCY)
August 9, 2019 Filing 31 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
August 9, 2019 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PNEUMO ABEX LLC.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of PNEUMO ABEX LLC with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint, together with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(HOWARTH, JOHN) Modified on 8/13/2019 (md).
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOULDS PUMPS LLC, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(ARTHUR, AARON) Modified on 8/9/2019 (md).
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of PEPBOYS (RYAN, DANIEL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC. (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT, Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS LLC with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BW/IP, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO..(KADISH, ERIC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. (KADISH, ERIC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. (PITT, TERENCE)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FMC CORPORATION.(REBER, W.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of FMC CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
July 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY. (amas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 190405010. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199945) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TONER et al v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO.
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEPBOYS
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORPORATION
Represented By: NANCY D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD TONER
Represented By: LAURA COVEY LASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDERIKA TONER
Represented By: LAURA COVEY LASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?