SANTANA v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: JESSICA SANTANA
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02951
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 7/26/19. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED. (rf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner of Social Security via FEDEX on 7/26/19. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED. (rf, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 8/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 7/16/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mbh, )
July 15, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (2) forwarded to the U.S. Marshal Service on 7/16/19 and (1) given to U.S. Attorney. (mbh, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AND U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 7/15/19. 7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(jl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JESSICA SANTANA (IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 JESSICA SANTANA MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANTANA v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA SANTANA
Represented By: JOHN W. CRAYNOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?