DURNELL et al v. FOTI et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER, JOHN DOE and SHEILA DURNELL
Defendant: SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC, CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, GERARD FOTI, D.O., JOHN DOE HEALTH SYSTEM and MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02972
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 9/6/19. 9/6/9 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT GERARD FOTI, DO AND SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC ANSWER BY 9/9/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/28/19. 8/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (va, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC. (GREEN, LAUREN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (md).
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(GOEBEL, CHILTON)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal filed by GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(GOEBEL, CHILTON)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SHEILA DURNELL, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NURICK, TODD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SHEILA DURNELL, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER.Memorandum, Declaration, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Catherine Damavandi, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(NURICK, TODD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by SHEILA DURNELL, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER Certificate of Merit Pursuant to Pa.R.C.P. 1042.3 as to Defendant Suburban Spine and Orthopedic Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NURICK, TODD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by SHEILA DURNELL, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER Certificate of Merit Pursuant to Pa.R.C.P. 1042.3 as to Defendant Gerard Foti, D.O. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NURICK, TODD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD B. NURICK on behalf of SHEILA DURNELL, CHARLES D. OPDENAKER with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NURICK, TODD)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY 8/9/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/31/19. 8/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service, by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM. (va, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS, together with MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, filed by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM. Certificate of Service. Exhibit. (va, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(CONROY, JOSEPH)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN CHANCLER on behalf of MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC. (CHANCLER, KATHLEEN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC OF INTENTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT OF NON PROS ON PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY CLAIM (GOEBEL, CHILTON)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH L. HOYNOSKI , III by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM. certificate of Service. (va, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN ALEXA GREEN on behalf of GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC (GREEN, LAUREN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. SHUSTED on behalf of GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC (SHUSTED, JOHN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC..(CONROY, JOSEPH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH V. CONROY, IV on behalf of MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(CONROY, JOSEPH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of CCP Delaware County County. (va, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GERARD FOTI, DO, SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC.(jaa, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GERARD FOTI, D.O., SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS DELAWARE COUNTY, case number 2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE200137)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURNELL et al v. FOTI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: CATHERINE DAMAVANDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES D. OPDENAKER
Represented By: CATHERINE DAMAVANDI
Represented By: TODD B. NURICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: CATHERINE DAMAVANDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA DURNELL
Represented By: CATHERINE DAMAVANDI
Represented By: TODD B. NURICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBURBAN SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC
Represented By: CHILTON G. GOEBEL, III
Represented By: LAUREN ALEXA GREEN
Represented By: JOHN P. SHUSTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: JOSEPH L. HOYNOSKI, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERARD FOTI, D.O.
Represented By: CHILTON G. GOEBEL, III
Represented By: LAUREN ALEXA GREEN
Represented By: JOHN P. SHUSTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE HEALTH SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIN LINE HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: KATHLEEN CHANCLER
Represented By: JOSEPH V. CONROY, IV
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?