DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION v. OLEKSIAK
Plaintiff: DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION
Defendant: W. GERALD OLEKSIAK
Case Number: 2:2019cv02978
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, SHELLEY)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 Counterclaim ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION.(SMITH, SHELLEY)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 Transcript of HEARING held on 8/1/2019, before Judge MARK A. KEARNEY. Court Reporter/Transcriber SUZANNE R. WHITE. (amas)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE COURT AMENDS THE 8/13/2019 ORDER (DOC. NO. #18 ) SOLELY TO RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE HELD ON 9/17/2019, AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE ON 9/9/2019, AT 8:45 AM, BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/13/2019. 8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION by W. GERALD OLEKSIAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to W)(LIGUORI, DARRYL)
August 5, 2019 The sum of $ 100.00 deposited into the Registry of the Court BY DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION ON 8/5/2019. (amas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. NO. #10 ) IS GRANTED UPON POSTING A $100.00 BOND WITH THE CLERK OF COURT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/2/2019. 8/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/2/2019. 8/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(NARDI, THOMAS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEYin Courtroom 6B Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019 re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION Court Reporter: SUZANNE WHITE. (amas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by W. GERALD OLEKSIAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Compact, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Matthew W. Kegg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LIGUORI, DARRYL)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT WE SHALL HEAR ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #10 ON THURSDAY, 8/1/19 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 6B WITH DEFENDANT GRANTED LEAVE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION COMPLIANT WITH OUR POLICIES NO LATER THAN NOON ON 7/31/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/26/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . RESPONSES DUE BY 7/31/2019. (fdc, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, SHELLEY)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2019 (amas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DARRYL J. LIGUORI on behalf of W. GERALD OLEKSIAK with Certificate of Service(LIGUORI, DARRYL)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR PLAINTIFF TO SEEK PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF WITH SUPPORTING EVIDENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/26/2019.7/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jeanne Morrison re: served Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Memorandum of Law, Letter to Judge Kearney upon Lisa Sauder, Assistant Chief Counsel by Personal Service Authorized to Accept on 07/24/2019 (SMITH, SHELLEY)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION re: Jeanne Morrison served Summons and Complaint upon W. GERALD OLEKSIAK by Personal Service on Gail Varney designated to accept service of process. W. GERALD OLEKSIAK served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (SMITH, SHELLEY)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CONFIRMING PROPER SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 7/25/2019, AT 10:00 AM. ASSUMING SERVICE IS CONFIRMED ON THE DOCKET COMPLAINT WITH THIS ORDER, THE COURT SHALL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 7/26/2019, AT 9:00 AM ON THE PENDING MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/24/2019. 7/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 for Oral Argument in Support of Plainitff's Motion if Court Finds Useful, by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION. (SMITH, SHELLEY)
July 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION HEARING SET FOR 7/26/2019 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. (amas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NARDI, THOMAS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. GERALD OLEKSIAK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 2000193.), filed by DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION.(ahf)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to W. GERALD OLEKSIAK. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/10/2019 (ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION v. OLEKSIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELAWARE RIVER JOINT TOLL BRIDGE COMMISSION
Represented By: SHELLEY R. SMITH
Represented By: THOMAS NARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. GERALD OLEKSIAK
Represented By: DARRYL J. LIGUORI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?