JOACHIM v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CLEMENT JOACHIM
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02979
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LINDA K CARACAPPA
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTATE JUDGE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 8/12/2019. 8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2019: #1 CONSENT) (sg, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 7/16/2019 Entered and copies e-mailed. (sg, )
July 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 1 TO AUSA 2 TO US MARSHALL on 7/12/2019 (sg, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE E.D.P.A. SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE AUSA FOR THE E.D.P.A.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 7/11/2019.7/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent to Assignment SS Case)(jwl, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by CLEMENT JOACHIM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by CLEMENT JOACHIM..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOACHIM v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEMENT JOACHIM
Represented By: NICHOLAS D. FEDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?