CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. v. DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Plaintiff: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Defendant: DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02989
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Referring Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2019. (sg, ) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lisad, ).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/3/2020 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3D BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/18/2020 01:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/6/2020. DISPOSITIVE/DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 2/24/2020. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 3/20/2020. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/6/2020 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3D BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 9/3/2019. 9/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/3/2019 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/26/2019. 8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/23/2019. 8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC... (HASKINS, MATTHEW)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC PALOMBO on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. with Certificate of Service(PALOMBO, ERIC)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/11/2019 08:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/8/2019. 8/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC..(HOGAN, MICHAEL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW JOHN HASKINS on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. with Certificate of Service(HASKINS, MATTHEW)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. MERRICK on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. with Certificate of Service(MERRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CSX CORPORATION for CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200224.), filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/10/19 (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. v. DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D. COHEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN HASKINS
Represented By: ERIC PALOMBO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MERRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE AVENUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?