CALILUNG et al v. CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Plaintiff: EVELYN CALILUNG and SALVADOR C CALILUNG
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02998
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Referring Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (RE: DOC. NO. #8 ) ON 11/5/2019, AT 10:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 15A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/3/2019. 9/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Remand with Certificate of Service filed by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Remand filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply)(GARNER, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG..(GARNER, MELANIE) Modified on 7/30/2019 (lvj, ).
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG.Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(GARNER, MELANIE)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF L. RICHARD DEROBERTIS, ESQUIRE, CHARLES S. SIEGEL, ESQUIRE, AND GIBBS HENDERSON, ESQUIRE (DOC. NOS. #4 , #5 , AND #6 ) ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/25/2019.7/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Gibbs Henderson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13690365.) filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG.Certificate of Service.(GARNER, MELANIE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Charles S. Siegel ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13690335.) filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG.Certificate of Service.(GARNER, MELANIE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice L. Richard DeRobertis ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13690296.) filed by EVELYN CALILUNG, SALVADOR C CALILUNG.Certificate of Service.(GARNER, MELANIE)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY TO HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, AS RELATED TO IN RE: ASBESTOS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, MDL NO. 01-MD-0875. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/15/2019. 7/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent COMPAGNIE DE SAINT-GOBAIN for CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION.(rf, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 009015. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE200247), EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Designation Form, #17 Case Management Track Form)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALILUNG et al v. CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN CALILUNG
Represented By: MELANIE J. GARNER
Represented By: L. RICHARD DEROBERTIS
Represented By: CHARLES S. SIEGEL
Represented By: GIBBS C HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVADOR C CALILUNG
Represented By: MELANIE J. GARNER
Represented By: L. RICHARD DEROBERTIS
Represented By: CHARLES S. SIEGEL
Represented By: GIBBS C HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?