ELANSARI v. TINDER, INC.
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Defendant: TINDER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03003
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-2789 (dmc, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), #4 Memorandum and/or Opinion by AMRO ELANSARI. IFP GRANTED. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (sg, ) Modified on 7/31/2019 (td, ).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/16/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/16/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
July 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against TINDER, INC., filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AMRO ELANSARI..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELANSARI v. TINDER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TINDER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?