ELANSARI v. PASSHE et al
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Defendant: PASSHE, JILL FLUKE and MICHAEL FERGUSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv03005
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #10 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-3020 (dmc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARIFP (IFP GRANTED) Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Part 1, #2 Exhibits - Part 2)(kw, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT & ATTACHED EXHIBITS AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS LEGALLY FRIVOLOUS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI.(AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED). (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits - Part 1, #3 Exhibits - Part 2, #4 Envelope)(kw, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ALONG WITH FORM FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT.(nds)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(nds)
July 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AMRO ELANSARI..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELANSARI v. PASSHE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL FLUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?