MORRIS v. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING et al
Plaintiff: KAREN LYNN MORRIS
Defendant: WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC, BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING and CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv03008
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (MA, YINAN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (CLARK, JULIA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. Amendment to #4 Waiver of Service Executed, WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by FHC Property Management LLC, incorrectly identified as Blue Harbour Senior Living. Waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELSEY BEERER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(BEERER, KELSEY)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
July 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. (jwl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING, CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP, WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13661199.), filed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS.(KARPF, ARI)
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING, CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP, WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/11/19 (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS v. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING
Represented By: JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
Represented By: KELSEY BEERER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN LYNN MORRIS
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: YINAN MA
Represented By: JULIA W. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?