SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 et al v. TEAM CLEAN, INC.
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS LEGAL SERVICE FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS WELFARE TRUST FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36, WAYNE MACMANIMAN, JR. and SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS PENSION TRUST FUND
Defendant: TEAM CLEAN, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03013
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR POST-RULE 16 INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STIPULATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/16/19. 8/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Post-Rule 16 Initial Pre-Trial Conference by WAYNE MACMANIMAN, JR, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS WELFARE TRUST FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS LEGAL SERVICE FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS PENSION TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTIN, SYRETTA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/19 (jaa, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/14/2019 2:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Information, #2 Notice)(pk, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SYREETA JOYCE MOORE on behalf of TEAM CLEAN, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOORE, SYREETA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TEAM CLEAN, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(MOORE, SYREETA) Modified on 7/30/2019 (tjd).
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Returned Executed on Team Clean, Inc. by WAYNE MACMANIMAN, JR, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS WELFARE TRUST FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS LEGAL SERVICE FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS PENSION TRUST FUND on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (MARTIN, SYRETTA) Modified on 7/23/2019 (tjd).
July 11, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to TEAM CLEAN, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/12/2019 (amas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEAM CLEAN, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200306.), filed by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS WELFARE TRUST FUND, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS LEGAL SERVICE FUND, WAYNE MACMANIMAN, JR, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS PENSION TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 et al v. TEAM CLEAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS LEGAL SERVICE FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS WELFARE TRUST FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE MACMANIMAN, JR.
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ, DISTRICT 36 BUILDING OPERATORS PENSION TRUST FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAM CLEAN, INC.
Represented By: SYREETA JOYCE MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?