MATARAZZO v. CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: ALFRED MATARAZZO, JR.
Defendant: CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03014
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #3 SUMMONSES, #4 SUMMONSES)(jaa, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/7/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEORGE G. MAHFOOD, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/5/2019.8/6/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO GEORGE MAHFOOD WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALFRED MATARAZZO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(QUINN, JOHN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George G. Mahfood by CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC.. (SERIANNI, NICOLA) Modified on 8/5/2019 (mbh, ). Fee paid on 8/2/19
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(SERIANNI, NICOLA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of George G. Mahfood filed by CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC.Certificate of Service, Declaration.(SERIANNI, NICOLA) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jaa, ). *FILED IN ERROR. (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/22/2019) (jaa, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, case number 2019-12401. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE200305)(dmc, ) Modified on 7/16/2019 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATARAZZO v. CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSENGE ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: NICOLA F. SERIANNI
Represented By: GEORGE G. MAHFOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED MATARAZZO, JR.
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?