Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC et al v. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC and Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC
Defendant: Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, FreedomPay, Inc. and BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03030
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 60 DEFENDANT FREEDOMPAY, INC.S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEMANDS FOR PUNITIVE AND CONSEQUENTIAL DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO RULE 12(f), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fdc)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FREEDOMPAY, INC.'S granting #58 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/14/19.11/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for Failure to State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Demands for Punitive and Consequential Damages and Attorneys Fees Pursuant to Rule 12(f) filed by FreedomPay, Inc..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for Failure to State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Demands for Punitive and Consequential Damages and Attorneys Fees Pursuant to Rule 12(f), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GILLER, RONALD)
October 30, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Demands for Punitive and Consequential Damages and Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to Rule 12(f) - Amended Complaint filed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KARCICH, DANIELLE)
October 16, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Demands for Punitive and Consequential Damages and Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to Rule 12(f) - Amended Complaint filed by FreedomPay, Inc..Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GILLER, RONALD)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT FREEDOMPAY, INC.'S LETTER REQUEST FOR A RULE 12(b) CONFERENCE (DOC. NO. #52 ) IT IS ORDERED THAT NO PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD. DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER IN WHICH TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/02/2019. 10/02/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 10/2/2019 (nd, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of FreedomPay, Inc. with Certificate of Service(GILLER, RONALD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC re #52 Notice (Other) (KARCICH, DANIELLE)
September 24, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by FreedomPay, Inc. re #50 Amended Complaint Pursuant to 12(b)(6) Procedural Order, Request for Pre-Motion Conference Seeking Leave to Move to Dismiss (SAKSEN, ALEXANDER)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE DUE TWENTY ONE (21) DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/4/19. 9/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 50 Amended Complaint against FreedomPay, Inc. filed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC and Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC., Certificate of Service.(mbh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION THAT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT BE DUE 21 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (KARCICH, DANIELLE) Modified on 9/3/2019 (fb).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT NO PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD IN LIGHT OF THE PARTIES' AGREEMENT THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER IN WHICH TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SHOULD DEFENDANTS STILL WISH TO PURSUE THEIR RULE 12(B) MOTION, THEY MAY FILE A NEW LETTER PURSUANT TO THE RULE 12(B) PROCEDURAL ORDER WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/15/19. 8/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC re #44 Notice (Other) Pursuant to Standing Procedural Order (KARCICH, DANIELLE)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #43 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ADAM K. BULT, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/8/19.8/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO BULT. (fdc)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #42 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TRAVIS F. CHANCE, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/8/19.8/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO CHANCE. (fdc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by FreedomPay, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Pursuant to 12(b)(6) Procedural Order, Request for Pre-Motion Conference Seeking Leave to File Motion to Dismiss (SAKSEN, ALEXANDER)
August 1, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Adam K. Bult ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13708037.) filed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC.Certificate of Service.(DORAN, PATRICK)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Travis S. Chance ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13707991.) filed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC.Certificate of Service.(DORAN, PATRICK)
July 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE M. KARCICH on behalf of Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC with Certificate of Service(KARCICH, DANIELLE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT - Joint by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (DORAN, PATRICK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. DORAN on behalf of Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC with Certificate of Service(DORAN, PATRICK)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:18-cv-01908. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot #30 Motion to Change Venue; ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that Canters Deli's negligence claim against FreedomPay, Inc. is hereby SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Canters Deli's remaining claims against Banc of America Merchant Services and Bank of America, N.A. are TRANSFERRED to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-01908-KJD-GWF. (no image attached) (ADR)[Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 2/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Pla Counsel: Adam Bult; Pla rep Kevin Jeffers present; Def Counsel: Craig Mariam, Rex Garner; Def reps Tim Hunter, Paul Baskowsky, and Marisa Nye present; Time of Hearing: 9:30 - 11:17 a.m. The Court, the parties, and counsel conferred, but no settlement was reached. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #30 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant FreedomPay, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #30 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Change Venue; filed by Defendant FreedomPay, Inc.. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Mariam, Craig) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The settlement conference statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked Confidential, directly to the undersigneds box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/13/19.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION re: Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Pending Motions and Referral to Settlement Conference, filed by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A.. (Garner, Rex) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #12 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant FreedomPay, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Reply Deadline to Defendants Bank of America Merchant Services, LLC and Bank of America's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Bult, Adam) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #10 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Bult, Adam) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Bult, Adam) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Bult, Adam) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #12 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/3/2018. Replies due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Bult, Adam) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add docket entry relationship (TR). [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #12 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Bult, Adam) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add docket entry relationship (TR). [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank Of America, N.A., Corporate Parent BAMS Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent FDS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Corporate Parent First Data Corporation for Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC; Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. added. (Garner, Rex) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by FreedomPay, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McChrystal, Lynne) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ariel E. Stern on behalf of Defendants Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A.. (Stern, Ariel) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 11/23/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Garner, Rex) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/2018. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant FreedomPay failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Defendant FreedomPay must file a certificate of interested parties no later than November 16, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant FreedomPay, Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Baskowsky, #2 Exhibit A - Switching Agreement) (Mariam, Craig) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Bank of America, N.A. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. FreedomPay, Inc. served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued FreedomPay, Inc. by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Bank of America N.A. by Plaintiffs Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Celebrity Brands LLC, Other Affiliate Tivoli Holding Firm LLC, Other Affiliate Perry Famularo for Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC; Other Affiliate Celebrity Brands LLC, Other Affiliate Perry Famularo, Other Affiliate High Roller Holding Firm LLC for Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC added. (Chance, Travis) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., FreedomPay, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5265587) by Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC, Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC. Proof of service due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Bult, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 7/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC et al v. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canters Deli Tivoli Village LLC
Represented By: Travis Franklin Chance
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: PATRICK J. DORAN
Represented By: DANIELLE M. KARCICH
Represented By: TRAVIS F. CHANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canters Deli Las Vegas LLC
Represented By: Travis Franklin Chance
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: PATRICK J. DORAN
Represented By: DANIELLE M. KARCICH
Represented By: TRAVIS F. CHANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Rex Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FreedomPay, Inc.
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: CRAIG J. MARIAM
Represented By: ALEXANDER W. SAKSEN
Represented By: RONALD A. GILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Rex Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?