SPENCE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: VANESSA SPENCE
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 2:2019cv03031
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 7/26/19. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED. (rf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner of Social Security via FEDEX on 7/26/19. FEDEX TRACKING SHEET ATTACHED. (rf, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, EXHIBITS filed by VANESSA SPENCE. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, ) Modified on 7/29/2019 (rf, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by VANESSA SPENCE. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) Modified on 7/29/2019 (rf, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.7/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SPENCE. (rf, )
July 16, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Summonses sent to US Marshal Service and 1 Summons to US Attorney on 7/16/19. (rf, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SUBSTITUTE ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, AS THE DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FRCP 25(d) AND 42 U.S.C. 405(g). THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 7/16/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SPENCE.(rf, )
July 12, 2019 Instructions, Request for appointment of attorney and protocol mailed to pro se plaintiff (jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent to Assignment SS Case)(jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by VANESSA SPENCE. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by VANESSA SPENCE..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPENCE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA SPENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?