SMART.EXE, INC, v. AIRTHEREUM LLC
Plaintiff: SMART.EXE, INC,
Defendant: AIRTHEREUM LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03048
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY E. VANBLUNK on behalf of AIRTHEREUM LLC with Certificate of Service(VANBLUNK, HENRY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Airthereum's Counterclaim Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) filed by SMART.EXE, INC,.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(AARONSON, ANNE)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 9/18/19 AT 10:00 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/20/19. 8/21/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gregory Goodwine re: served Complaint upon Registered Agent by personal service on July 29, 2019 (NANA-SINKAM, CHRISTOPHER)
August 16, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AIRTHEREUM LLC. (SEE PAPER #4 FOR ATTACHMENT)(lvj, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Disclosure Form by AIRTHEREUM LLC. (KERNAN, ERIN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIRTHEREUM LLC re #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (KERNAN, ERIN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against SMART.EXE, INC, by AIRTHEREUM LLC.(KERNAN, ERIN)
July 16, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
July 16, 2019 One Summons Issued as to AIRTHEREUM LLC. Forwarded To: CHRISTOPHER NANA-SINKHAM, ESQ. on 7/16/2019 (dmc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIRTHEREUM LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE200387.), filed by SMART.EXE, INC,. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMART.EXE, INC, v. AIRTHEREUM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART.EXE, INC,
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES NANA-SINKAM
Represented By: ANNE MARIE AARONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRTHEREUM LLC
Represented By: HENRY E. VANBLUNK
Represented By: ERIN N. KERNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?